EP4243316 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SENDING AND RECEIVING WIRELESS WAKE-UP PACKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIA, Jia Shenzhen / CN | 02 /
GAN, Ming Shenzhen / CN | 03 /
YANG, Xun Shenzhen / CN | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 23167746.9 | 22.12.2018 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | CN201711409077 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711409077 | [2023/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4243316 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4243316 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, // H04L5/00 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04W52/0225 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (CN,US);
H04L5/0048 (CN);
H04W52/0274 (CN,KR,US);
H04W52/028 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN EINES DRAHTLOSEN AUFWECKPAKETS | [2023/37] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SENDING AND RECEIVING WIRELESS WAKE-UP PACKET | [2023/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ENVOI ET DE RÉCEPTION DE PAQUET DE RÉVEIL SANS FIL | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18892090.4 / EP3720194 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |