EP4235430 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ADAPTING PROGRAMS FOR INTEROPERABILITY AND ADAPTERS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clinicomp International, Inc. 9655 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUDENSCHILD, Chris A. San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23167754.3 | 13.08.2020 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | US201916542259 | 15.08.2019 Original published format: US201916542259 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4235430 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4235430 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/25 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
G06F9/541 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G06F16/252 (IL,KR,US);
G06F16/258 (EP,CN,IL);
G06F16/2433 (CN);
G06F16/2448 (IL,KR,US);
G06F16/2453 (CN);
G06F16/24547 (IL,KR,US);
G06F16/25 (EP,IL);
G06N3/065 (EP,IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | G06F9/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ANPASSUNG VON PROGRAMMEN FÜR INTEROPERABILITÄT UND ADAPTER DAFÜR | [2023/35] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ADAPTING PROGRAMS FOR INTEROPERABILITY AND ADAPTERS THEREFOR | [2023/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR ADAPTER DES PROGRAMMES POUR UNE INTEROPÉRABILITÉ ET ADAPTATEURS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 28.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20851658.3 / EP4014127 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5970490 | US6792431 | US6880151 | US8386442 | US2014032608 | US9135297 | US9201874 |