EP4260940 - PORTABLE SYSTEM FOR CRUSHING CONSTRUCTION AND DEMOLITION WASTE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reason Panoply, LDA 4400-315 Vila Nova de Gaia / PT | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGOSTINI, TIAGO 89900-000 B. SANTA RITA - SÃO MIGUEL DO OESTE-SC / BR | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Patentree Edificio Net Rua de Salazares, 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 23167853.3 | 13.04.2023 | [2023/42] | Priority number, date | PT20220117909 | 13.04.2022 Original published format: PT 2022117909 | [2023/42] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4260940 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B02C1/04, B02C23/02, B02C23/10 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B02C23/02 (EP);
B02C1/043 (EP);
B02C23/10 (EP);
B02C23/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] |
Former [2023/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES SYSTEM ZUM ZERKLEINERN VON BAU- UND ABBRUCHABFÄLLEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/42] | English: | PORTABLE SYSTEM FOR CRUSHING CONSTRUCTION AND DEMOLITION WASTE AND USE THEREOF | [2023/42] | French: | SYSTÈME PORTABLE POUR BROYER DES DÉCHETS DE CONSTRUCTION ET DE DÉMOLITION ET SON UTILISATION | [2023/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 18.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2190856 (RODGER IAN GORDON) [A] 2,4* page 2, column r; figure 2 *; | [XYI]EP0382922 (DUDWEILER UNTERTAGE MASCH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,10,13 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8,14 [I] 2,4,9,11,12,15; | [XAI]CA2415516 (HA YONGGAN [CA]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,13 * pages 5,6; figures 1,15 * [A] 4,6,14 [I] 7,11,12,15; | [YA]WO2008129287 (FINLAY HYDRASCREENS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 6 * pages 8-9; figures 1-4 * [A] 1-5,7-15; | [YA]US7971817 (ROSSI JR ROBERT R [US]) [Y] 7,8,14 * columns 8-11 * [A] 1-6,9-13,15 | by applicant | US6915972 | EP1600565 |