EP4234791 - CONTROL METHOD OF A LAUNDRY MACHINE HAVING INDUCTION HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 12.01.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Sangwook 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
KIM, Woore 08592 Seoul / KR | 03 /
KIM, Beomjun 08592 Seoul / KR | 04 /
NOH, Hyunwoo 08592 Seoul / KR | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23168159.4 | 27.12.2019 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | KR20180169654 | 26.12.2018 Original published format: KR 20180169654 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4234791 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/65, D06F58/44, // D06F39/00, D06F58/20, D06F105/40, D06F103/16, D06F103/32, D06F103/70 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
D06F33/65 (EP,CN,KR);
D06F39/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F33/52 (CN);
D06F33/00 (US);
D06F33/70 (KR);
D06F34/08 (KR);
D06F34/14 (US);
D06F35/005 (KR);
D06F37/304 (KR);
D06F39/02 (KR);
D06F39/04 (KR,US);
D06F39/085 (KR);
D06F39/088 (KR,US);
D06F58/44 (EP);
H05B6/10 (KR);
D06F2103/16 (EP);
D06F2103/32 (EP);
D06F2103/62 (KR);
D06F2103/70 (EP);
D06F2105/40 (EP,KR);
D06F2105/48 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE WASCHMASCHINE MIT INDUKTIONSHEIZUNG | [2023/35] | English: | CONTROL METHOD OF A LAUNDRY MACHINE HAVING INDUCTION HEATER | [2023/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE MACHINE À LAVER LE LINGE AYANT UN DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 11.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19219760.6 / EP3674467 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006098571 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] *; | [A]EP2767629 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0098]; figures 3, 4 * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0138]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0190] ** paragraph [0217] - paragraph [0229]; figure 6 *; | [A]DE102016110883 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053]; figures 5, 6 * | by applicant | KR20180123451 |