EP4231124 - USER INTERFACES FOR AUDIO MEDIA CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRIGAN, Taylor G. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 02 /
COFFMAN, Patrick L. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 03 /
FOSS, Christopher Patrick Cupertino, 95014 / US | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 23168537.1 | 31.05.2020 | [2023/34] | Priority number, date | US201962855852P | 31.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962855852 P | US201916583989 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: US201916583989 | US201916584490 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: US201916584490 | US202063032603P | 30.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063032603 P | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4231124 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0482, G06F3/0481, G06F3/04842, G06F3/04883, G06F3/16, H04M1/72412, H04M1/72442, H04M1/72457 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H04M1/72412 (EP,KR);
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/167 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/016 (CN);
G06F3/017 (KR,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/04842 (EP);
G06F3/165 (CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] |
Former [2023/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLEN ZUR AUDIOMEDIENSTEUERUNG | [2023/34] | English: | USER INTERFACES FOR AUDIO MEDIA CONTROL | [2023/34] | French: | INTERFACES UTILISATEUR POUR COMMANDE DE SUPPORT AUDIO | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 12.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20760624.5 / EP3948517 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015286360 (WACHTER MARTIN RICHARD [US]); | [XI]US2016241983 (LAMBOURNE ROBERT A [US], et al); | [Y]US2017068507 (KIM JI-HYAE [KR], et al); | [Y]US2018335903 (COFFMAN PATRICK L [US], et al) | by applicant | US6323846 | US2002015024 | US6570557 | US2005190059 | US2006017692 | US7657849 | WO2013169849 | WO2014105276 | US19620108408 | US19640109039 | US19620609365 | US20050038590 | US20050048264 | US20050228758 | US20050228700 | US20050228737 | US20050322549 | US20060367749 | US20060381313 | US20070968067 | US20080240788 | US20080241839 | US20090586862 | US20090620702 | US20090638251 | WO2013US40061 | WO2013US69483 |