EP4275929 - TWIST BEAM AXLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH An der Talle 27-31 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Klaus 34431 Marsberg / DE | 02 /
SCHULTZ, Erik 33102 Paderborn / DE | 03 /
RUDI, Vitalis 33104 Paderborn / DE | 04 /
BÜRGER, Manfred 33181 Bad Wünnenberg / DE | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Ksoll, Peter Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 23168702.1 | 19.04.2023 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | DE202210111981 | 12.05.2022 Original published format: DE102022111981 | [2023/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4275929 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4275929 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60G21/05 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
B60G21/052 (EP);
B60G7/001 (CN);
B60G21/051 (CN);
B60G7/008 (CN);
B60G2200/20 (EP);
B60G2200/21 (CN);
B60G2204/10 (EP);
B60G2206/20 (CN);
B60G2206/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | VERBUNDLENKERACHSE | [2023/46] | English: | TWIST BEAM AXLE | [2023/46] | French: | ESSIEU À TRAVERSE DÉFORMABLE | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 20.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2327573 (FIAT GROUP AUTOMOBILES SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0016] , [ 0024] * [I] 4-8; | [A]DE102014107896 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [XI]CN106828009 (YUAN LU) [X] 1-3,9 * figures 1, 9, 13, 14 * * paragraph [0050] * [I] 4-8; | [A]CN208978585U (WELTMEISTER INTELLIGENT TRAVEL TECH SHANGHAI CO LTD) [A] 4-8 * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE29519965U | DE102009010098 |