EP4266319 - INSULIN ADAPTATION AND SAFETY MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Insulet Corporation 100 Nagog Park Acton MA 01720 / US | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARAYANASWAMI, Rangarajan Weston / US | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 23169035.5 | 20.04.2023 | [2023/43] | Priority number, date | US202263333149P | 21.04.2022 Original published format: US 202263333149 P | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4266319 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/17, G16H20/30, G16H20/60, G16H40/67, G16H50/20, G16H50/30 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
G16H20/17 (EP);
G16H20/10 (US);
A61B5/14532 (US);
A61B5/14546 (US);
A61M5/14248 (US);
A61M5/1723 (US);
G16H20/30 (EP);
G16H20/60 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61M2202/0486 (US);
A61M2205/3303 (US);
A61M2205/502 (US);
A61M2205/52 (US);
A61M2230/201 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSULINANPASSUNG UND SICHERHEITSÜBERWACHUNG | [2023/43] | English: | INSULIN ADAPTATION AND SAFETY MONITORING | [2023/43] | French: | ADAPTATION DE L'INSULINE ET SURVEILLANCE DE LA SÉCURITÉ | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 30.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2020101222 (LINTEREUR LOUIS J [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 27] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraphs [0084] , [0113] * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US10736548 (AHMAD LUBNA [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 30 - column 4, line 57 * * figures 1-6, 9,11-13, 17, 27, 30-33 ** column 50, line 29 - column 54, line 14 *; | [IA] - Lee Melissa H. ET AL, "The Clinical Case for the Integration of a Ketone Sensor as Part of a Closed Loop Insulin Pup System", Journal of Diabetes Science and Technology Diabetes Technology Society, Vol. 13(5), doi:10.1177/1932296818822986, (20191231), pages 967 - 973, URL: https://journals.sagepub.com/doi/pdf/10.1177/1932296818822986, (20230630), XP093059574 [I] 11-16 * abstract * * page 967 - page 972 * [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1932296818822986 | [A] - ROMETO DAVID ET AL, "Perioperative Glycemic Management of Patients Undergoing Bariatric Surgery", CURRENT DIABETES REPORTS, CURRENT SCIENCE, PHILADELPHIA, VA, US, vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S11892-016-0718-6, ISSN 1534-4827, (20160215), pages 1 - 8, (20160215), XP035627777 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11892-016-0718-6 |