EP4265963 - HEATING APPARATUS, BURNER DEVICE, AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kennedy, John 44 Oxford Drive Blackburn Lancashire BB1 2DW / GB | For all designated states Harris, Chris Pottles Farmhouse Days Pottles Lane Exminster Devon EX6 8BB / GB | For all designated states Archer, James Brocksford Farm Doveridge Ashbourne Derbyshire DE6 5PA / GB | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Rule, John Eric Coulson & Rule 13 Whitehall Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 23169042.1 | 20.04.2023 | [2023/43] | Priority number, date | GB20220005838 | 21.04.2022 Original published format: GB 202205838 | GB20220018321 | 06.12.2022 Original published format: GB 202218321 | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265963 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/04, F23D14/46, F24C3/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
F23D14/045 (EP);
F23D14/46 (EP);
F24C3/006 (EP);
F24C3/082 (EP);
F23D2900/21004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] |
Former [2023/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIZVORRICHTUNG, BRENNERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONSTRUKTION | [2023/43] | English: | HEATING APPARATUS, BURNER DEVICE, AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION | [2023/43] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE, DISPOSITIF DE BRÛLEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 19.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]CA721584 (PAPPAS PHILLIP M); | [YA]US4875464 (SHIMEK RONALD J [US], et al); | [A]US2005196715 (SHUMWAY STEPHEN L [US]); |