EP4277442 - DIRECT-CURRENT PLASMA TORCH APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Handa, Janak H. 92 Northcliffe Blvd. Toronto, ON M6H 3H2 / CA | For all designated states Gaber, Hossam 27 Pleasant View Drive North York, ON M2J 3P7 / CA | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaber, Hossam North York, Ontario M2J 3P7 / CA | 02 /
Aldeeb, Mustafa Abdalmejeed Mansour Cambridge, N3E 1B8 / CA | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Bobbert & Partner Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 1252 85422 Erding / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 23169157.7 | 21.04.2023 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | US202217660402 | 23.04.2022 Original published format: US202217660402 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4277442 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4277442 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/34 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H05H1/3436 (EP);
H05H1/28 (EP,US);
H05H1/3442 (EP);
H05H1/3447 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROM-PLASMABRENNER | [2023/46] | English: | DIRECT-CURRENT PLASMA TORCH APPARATUS | [2023/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE TORCHE À PLASMA À COURANT CONTINU | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/35] | 24.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2110145 (WELDTRONIC LIMITED) [Y] 3 * figures 1-6 * * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 128 *; | [XYI]EP2209354 (REINHAUSEN PLASMA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0033] * [Y] 3 [I] 5,9; | [A]WO2012123530 (REINHAUSEN PLASMA GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-2 ** page 1, line 5 - page 28, line 30 *; | [XI]US2014265044 (FORET TODD [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8 * figures 1A-2 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0034] * [I] 5,9; | [A]CN105478974 (HARBIN INST OF TECH (WEIHAI), et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 * * abstract * |