EP4265358 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POROUS PART BY LASER POWDER BED FUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 06.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHAN, Maxime 38054 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
BAFFIE, Thierry 38054 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 03 /
GARANDET, Jean-Paul 38054 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 23169263.3 | 21.04.2023 | [2023/43] | Priority number, date | FR20220003754 | 22.04.2022 Original published format: FR 2203754 | [2023/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265358 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B22F10/28, B22F3/11, B22F5/10, B22F10/36, B22F10/38, F28F21/08, F28D15/04, B33Y10/00, B33Y50/02, B33Y80/00, F28F13/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
B22F10/28 (EP);
B22F10/36 (EP);
B22F10/38 (EP);
B22F3/1103 (EP);
B22F5/10 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y50/02 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
F28D15/046 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/36, B22F10/366, B22F1/05, B22F10/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PORÖSEN TEILS DURCH LASERSCHMELZEN AUF EINEM PULVERBETT | [2023/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POROUS PART BY LASER POWDER BED FUSION | [2023/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PIÈCE POREUSE PAR FUSION LASER SUR LIT DE POUDRE | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5625861 (NISHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [I] 13-15* example 14 *; | [A]US2019299290 (KUHNS MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 48] , [0050] , [0053] - [0063] - [0093] , [0094] , [0111] * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2,5,7 *; | [T] - KING W E ET AL, "Laser powder bed fusion additive manufacturing of metals; physics, computational, and materials challenges", APPLIED PHYSICS REVIEWS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, 2 HUNTINGTON QUADRANGLE, MELVILLE, NY 11747, (20151229), vol. 2, no. 4, doi:10.1063/1.4937809, XP012204143 [T] * page 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4937809 | by applicant | FR2010978 | EP3279597 | - D. JAFARI et al., Applied Thermal Engineering, (20180000), vol. 143, pages 403 - 314 | - M. AMELI et al., Applied Thermal Engineering, (20130000), vol. 52, pages 498 - 504 |