EP4233633 - HAIR CARE APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SharkNinja Operating LLC 89 A Street, Suite 100 Needham, MA 02494 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higgins, Colby Jackson Randolph, 02368 / US | 02 /
Udy, Adam Eastbourne, BN20 9DB / GB | 03 /
Murphy, Stephen Watertown, 02472 / US | 04 /
Godden, Stephan James Woking, GU22 9QW / GB | 05 /
Mathias, Richard Wellesley, 02482 / US | 06 /
Sardar, Nicholas James London, E8 1AB / GB | 07 /
Richards, Joshua Thomas Hassocks, BN6 8NP / GB | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Finch, Steven Caffall Novagraaf UK 3rd Floor 77 Gracechurch Street London EC3V 0AS / GB | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23169331.8 | 11.07.2022 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | US202163279041P | 12.11.2021 Original published format: US 202163279041 P | US202217737518 | 05.05.2022 Original published format: US202217737518 | US202217737565 | 05.05.2022 Original published format: US202217737565 | US202217737596 | 05.05.2022 Original published format: US202217737596 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4233633 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4233633 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A45D20/12 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
A45D20/12 (EP,CN,KR);
A45D20/10 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | HAARPFLEGEGERÄT | [2023/35] | English: | HAIR CARE APPLIANCE | [2023/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE SOINS CAPILLAIRES | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 31.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2024 | Observations by third parties | 24.04.2024 | Observations by third parties | 13.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP22184225.5 / EP4179916 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2021078633 (SEB SA [FR]); | [XA]CN113180525 (DREAME TECH SHANGHAI CO LTD); | [A]US2021267341 (YOO HEE JO [KR]) | other | US3261107 | US4122329 | US4198556 | US4647757 | US2015007444 | US2015192325 | US2017150797 | CN111387672 | CN211459143U | KR20200116277 | CN211672808U | CN112315167 | CN113080595 |