EP4266080 - ASSURANCE MONITORING OF RADAR SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Collins, Inc. 400 Collins Road NE Cedar Rapids, IA 52498 / US | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Brandon E. Portland, OR, 97225 / US | 02 /
TIANA, Carlo L. Portland, OR, 97215 / US | 03 /
FINLEY, Jeffery A. Cedar Rapids, IA, 52411 / US | 04 /
HELFRECHT, Brian O. Batavia, IL, 60510 / US | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 23169544.6 | 24.04.2023 | [2023/43] | Priority number, date | US202217727326 | 22.04.2022 Original published format: US202217727326 | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4266080 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/03, H01Q3/26, G01S13/91, G01S7/40 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
G01S7/032 (EP);
G01S7/40 (US);
G01S13/913 (EP);
G01S7/4008 (US);
G01S7/4017 (EP);
G01S7/4021 (EP);
G01S7/4091 (EP);
H01Q21/0006 (EP);
H01Q21/061 (EP);
H01Q3/267 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] |
Former [2023/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSÜBERWACHUNG VON RADARSYSTEMEN | [2023/43] | English: | ASSURANCE MONITORING OF RADAR SYSTEMS | [2023/43] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE L'ASSURANCE DE SYSTÈMES RADAR | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 24.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5412414 (AST HARRY C [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 36 * * column 5, lines 1-10 * * column 16, line 54 - line 66 *; | [XYI]US2012169540 (JONES DAVID KELVIN [GB]) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] - [0062] - [0072] - [0078] * [Y] 15 [I] 6-8,10-15; | [Y]CN110474697 (SHANGHAI AEROSPACE ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT RES INST) [Y] 15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0052] - [0061] * |