Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP4329066


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.2024 New entry: Fee payment for validation state
30.08.2024 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
30.08.2024 Change: Validation states published on  02.10.2024  [2024/40]
30.08.2024 Request for examination filed published on  02.10.2024  [2024/40]
30.08.2024 Change - designated states published on  02.10.2024  [2024/40]
27.08.2024 Amendment by applicant
26.01.2024 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.02.2024  [2024/09]
03.01.2024 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
19.09.2023 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
26.04.2023 Change - representative