blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4329066

EP4329066 - SCREW FOR BATTERY CASE FOR A VEHICLE AND ASSEMBLY OF VEHICLE BATTERY CASE PLUS ONE OR MORE SCREWS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.08.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.01.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2024New entry: Fee payment for validation state 
30.08.2024The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
30.08.2024Change: Validation statespublished on 02.10.2024  [2024/40]
30.08.2024Request for examination filedpublished on 02.10.2024  [2024/40]
30.08.2024Change - designated statespublished on 02.10.2024  [2024/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Defta
10 rue de la Fontaine Rouge
Immeuble le Galilée
77700 Chessy / FR
[2024/09]
Inventor(s)01 / VERASTEGUI JURADO, David Miguel
CHESSY / FR
02 / CARDARELLI, Piero
CHESSY / FR
 [2024/09]
Representative(s)Ponti & Partners, S.L.P
Edifici PRISMA
Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2
08028 Barcelona / ES
[2024/09]
Application number, filing date23169625.324.04.2023
[2024/09]
Priority number, dateES2022003037125.04.2022         Original published format: ES 202230371
[2024/09]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4329066
Date:28.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2024
ClassificationIPC:H01M50/249, B60L50/64, H01M50/258, H01M50/262, F16B23/00
[2024/09]
CPC:
H01M50/249 (EP,ES); B60K1/04 (ES); B60L50/64 (EP,ES);
F16B35/00 (ES); F16B35/06 (EP); H01M50/258 (EP,ES);
H01M50/262 (EP); F16B37/044 (EP); Y02E60/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/40]
Former [2024/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  ME,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MA27.08.2024
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHRAUBE FÜR EIN BATTERIEGEHÄUSE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG UND MONTAGE EINES FAHRZEUGBATTERIEGEHÄUSES MIT EINER ODER MEHRERER SCHRAUBEN[2024/09]
English:SCREW FOR BATTERY CASE FOR A VEHICLE AND ASSEMBLY OF VEHICLE BATTERY CASE PLUS ONE OR MORE SCREWS[2024/09]
French:VIS POUR BOÎTIER DE BATTERIE POUR UN VÉHICULE ET ENSEMBLE DE BOÎTIER DE BATTERIE DE VÉHICULE PLUS UNE OU PLUSIEURS VIS[2024/09]
Examination procedure15.08.2023Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
20.09.2023Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
27.08.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.08.2024Examination requested  [2024/40]
27.08.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP0999076  (SKF IND SPA [IT]);
 [Y]US2005073190  (WAKISAKA TERUYUKI [JP], et al);
 [Y]CN208364583U  (TIANJIN EV ENERGIES CO LTD);
 [XYI]CN209309081U  (GUANGDONG SHILI TECH CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.