EP4296162 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTING A HELICOPTER HAVING A WINCH ON BOARD, WINCH PROVIDED WITH SUCH A DEVICE AND HELICOPTER HAVING SUCH A WINCH ON BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REEL 69 rue de la Chaux 69450 Saint-Cyr au Mont d'Or / FR | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIGOUREUX, David 13300 SALON DE PROVENCE / FR | 02 /
CAUQUELIN, Adrien 69009 LYON / FR | 03 /
DECREUSEFOND, Sébastien 13330 PELISSANNE / FR | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23170245.7 | 27.04.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | FR20220006224 | 23.06.2022 Original published format: FR 2206224 | [2023/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296162 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B64D1/02, B64D3/02 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B64D1/02 (EP);
B64D1/08 (CN);
B64D1/22 (US);
B64C27/04 (US);
B64D3/02 (EP);
B64D45/00 (CN,US);
B66D1/54 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG EINES HUBSCHRAUBERS, DER EINE WINDE UMFASST, WINDE MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG UND HUBSCHRAUBER, DER EINE SOLCHE WINDE UMFASST | [2023/52] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROTECTING A HELICOPTER HAVING A WINCH ON BOARD, WINCH PROVIDED WITH SUCH A DEVICE AND HELICOPTER HAVING SUCH A WINCH ON BOARD | [2023/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION D'UN HÉLICOPTÈRE EMBARQUANT UN TREUIL, TREUIL MUNI D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF ET HÉLICOPTÈRE EMBARQUANT UN TEL TREUIL | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 20.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO0076845 (SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORP [US]) |