Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
10.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
10.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
06.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.09.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
28.04.2023 | Change - representative |