EP4269925 - PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Sanhua Research Institute Co., Ltd. No. 289-2, 12th Street Economic & Technological Development Area Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310018 / CN | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xiaobin Zhejiang, 310018 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Ting Zhejiang, 310018 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Junjie Zhejiang, 310018 / CN | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 23170746.4 | 28.04.2023 | [2023/44] | Priority number, date | CN202210456457 | 28.04.2022 Original published format: CN202210456457 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4269925 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
F28D9/005 (EP);
F28D9/0031 (CN);
F28F3/025 (US);
F28F3/046 (EP,CN,US);
F28F3/08 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] |
Former [2023/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER | [2023/44] | English: | PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER | [2023/44] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR À PLAQUES | [2023/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 02.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2585783 (ALFA LAVAL CORP AB [SE]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0031]; figures 5,8; examples 1-6 *; | [XY]US2021063091 (LEE SUKYOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0139]; figures 1,3,4,6; claims 7,10, 11,12 * [Y] 6-8; | [A]EP3828489 (ALFA LAVAL CORP AB [SE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0057]; figures 4-7b *; | [YA]WO2021154152 (SWEP INT AB [SE]) [Y] 6-8 * page 6, line 24 - page 10, line 5; figure 5, * * page 11, line 6 - line 26; figure 7a * [A] 10 |