Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019132896 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023402042 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318239619 | 29.08.2023 | US201816308620 | 10.12.2018 | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | US202117154571 | 21.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11798565 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2023 | B2 | US2021233542 | 29.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816308620 | 10.12.2018 | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | US202117154571 | 21.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10937431 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2021 | B2 | US2020395021 | 17.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102451348B | Global Dossier | 06.10.2022 | B1 | KR20200101934 | 28.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7127131B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2022 | B2 | JP2021516356 | 01.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3732675 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2023 | B1 | EP3732675 | 04.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111527541 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3083453 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017444907B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2023 | B2 | AU2017444907 | 11.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4246508 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2023 | A3 | EP4246508 | 20.09.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP23170882 | 27.12.2017 | EP17832867 | 27.12.2017 | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR113680 | 27.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US68581 | 27.12.2017 | Type | Earlier application | EP3732675 |