EP4246508 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING USERS BASED ON VOICE DATA AND MEDIA CONSUMPTION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adeia Guides Inc. 3025 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2024/36] |
Former [2023/38] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose, CA 95002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTHEWS, Sean Los Altos, 94022 / US | 02 /
MAUGHAN, Benjamin, H. Pleasanton, 94566 / US | 03 /
LENHART, Kevin, B. Campbell, 95008 / US | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23170882.7 | 27.12.2017 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4246508 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4246508 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22, G10L17/00, G10L17/22, H04H60/45 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G10L15/22 (EP);
G10L17/06 (KR,US);
G10L17/22 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/242 (KR);
G06F16/248 (KR);
G06F16/9535 (KR);
G10L15/14 (KR);
G10L17/00 (EP,US);
G10L17/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | G10L17/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON BENUTZERN AUF BASIS VON SPRACHDATEN UND MEDIENKONSUMDATEN | [2023/38] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING USERS BASED ON VOICE DATA AND MEDIA CONSUMPTION DATA | [2023/38] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'IDENTIFICATION D'UTILISATEURS SUR LA BASE DE DONNÉES VOCALES ET DE DONNÉES DE CONSOMMATION MULTIMÉDIA | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 15.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17832867.0 / EP3732675 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014052451 (CHEONG YUEN-KEEN [US], et al); | [Y]US2016094874 (VENKATARAMAN SASHIKUMAR [US], et al); | [A]WO2017147081 (SONOS INC [US]) | by applicant | US6239794 | US2002174430 | US6564378 | US2005251827 | US7165098 | US2010153885 | US7761892 | US8046801 |