EP4276361 - COOKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COOKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellersiek, Ralf 32257 Bünde / DE | 02 /
Kochmann, Tobias 32130 Enger / DE | 03 /
Zerbian, Thomas 49124 Georgsmarienhütte / DE | 04 /
Neugebauer, Johannes 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | 05 /
Besgen, Jan 33729 Bielefeld / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 23171005.4 | 02.05.2023 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | BE20220005349 | 09.05.2022 Original published format: BE 202205349 | [2023/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276361 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F24C14/00, F24C7/08, // F24C15/02 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
F24C14/005 (EP);
F24C7/085 (EP);
F24C15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GARGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES GARGERÄTS | [2023/46] | English: | COOKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COOKING DEVICE | [2023/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE CUISSON ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL DE CUISSON | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19846862 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 4-6 * column 3, line 27 - line 31; figure - *; | [A]DE102005050832 (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] , [0023] , [0040] *; | [A]EP2584271 (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 2,3,8 * paragraph [0018] *; | [A]DE102014117372 (GUGGENBERGER REINIGUNGSTECHNIK E K [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0118] *; | [Y]EP3190344 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [Y] 1,7 * paragraphs [0023] , [ 0026] , [ 0029]; figure - *; | [A]EP3346192 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1,7* paragraph [0001]; figure - *; | [Y]DE102020106645 (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [Y] 1,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0037] *; | [AP]EP4119849 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [AP] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19846862 | DE102005050832 | EP2584271 | DE102014117372 | EP3346192 | DE102020106645 |