EP4274090 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING MECHANICAL PARAMETERS OF AN ELECTRIC MOTOR AND LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP USA, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive Austin TX 78735 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Musak, Marek 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Fedor, Tomas 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Stulrajter, Marek 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Richard NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23171061.7 | 02.05.2023 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | US202217739023 | 06.05.2022 Original published format: US202217739023 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4274090 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02P21/18, H02P21/20 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H02P21/20 (EP);
H02P21/22 (US);
H02P21/10 (US);
H02P21/13 (US);
H02P21/18 (EP,US);
H02P21/34 (US);
H02P2207/05 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG MECHANISCHER PARAMETER EINES ELEKTROMOTORS UND EINER LAST | [2023/45] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING MECHANICAL PARAMETERS OF AN ELECTRIC MOTOR AND LOAD | [2023/45] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE PARAMÈTRES MÉCANIQUES D'UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET D'UNE CHARGE | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003233200 (PETROVIC VLADAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2014028224 (ARIMA HIROKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1,2 * |