EP4273338 - SEPARATION DEVICE FOR REMOVING SOLIDS FROM WASTE WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kraus, Oliver Hauptstrasse 43 79777 Ühlingen-Birkendorf / DE | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Mertzlufft-Paufler, Cornelius, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23171592.1 | 04.05.2023 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | DE202210111102 | 05.05.2022 Original published format: DE102022111102 | [2023/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273338 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/12, E03F5/14 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
E03F5/125 (EP);
E03F5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEPARATIONSANLAGE ZUM ENTFERNEN VON FESTSTOFFEN AUS ABWASSER | [2023/45] | English: | SEPARATION DEVICE FOR REMOVING SOLIDS FROM WASTE WATER | [2023/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION POUR ÉLIMINER DES MATIÈRES SOLIDES D'EAUX USÉES | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 16.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2811691 (SUEZ LYONNAISE DES EAUX [FR]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]US2010200483 (GIEHL KLAUS ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1-5,9-12 * figure 1 *; | [XI]CN111456209 (SHANGHAI URBAN CONSTR DESIGN RES INST GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [I] 13-15 |