EP4276729 - AUCTIONS IN EXTENDED REALITY ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 15.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eBay Inc. 2025 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | [2024/01] |
Former [2023/46] | For all designated states eBay, Inc. 2025 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELAVY, Stefan San Jose 95125 / US | 02 /
HARO, Antonio San Jose 95125 / US | 03 /
CHALKLEY, Andrew San Jose 95125 / US | 04 /
RANGASWAMI, Deepak San Jose 95125 / US | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 23171807.3 | 05.05.2023 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | US202217743692 | 13.05.2022 Original published format: US202217743692 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276729 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/08 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06T19/006 (US);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04L67/131 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUKTIONEN IN UMGEBUNGEN MIT ERWEITERTER REALITÄT | [2023/46] | English: | AUCTIONS IN EXTENDED REALITY ENVIRONMENTS | [2023/46] | French: | ENCHÈRES DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS DE RÉALITÉ ÉTENDUE | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 14.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009047959 (CYBER MAXIMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]KR20180124794 (KIM JU YOUNG [KR]) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]CN109792488 (QUALCOMM INC) [Y] 1-5,8-15 * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0105] *; | [Y]US2020160289 (MAHAJAN AMITT [US], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]US2020193510 (ZOLFO MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2021201392 (AGHDAII NIMA [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0236] * * paragraph [0247] * |