EP4245463 - FASTENER EXTRACTOR AND DISLODGING TOOL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grip Holdings LLC 1202 Telfair Rd Brandon, FL 33510 / US | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kukucka, Paul Brandon, 33509 / US | 02 /
Kukucka, Thomas Stefan Brandon, 33509 / US | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23171947.7 | 25.07.2019 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | US201862733507P | 19.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862733507 P | US201916255341 | 23.01.2019 Original published format: US201916255341 | US201916514117 | 17.07.2019 Original published format: US201916514117 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245463 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25B13/06, B25B15/00, B25B23/08, B25B23/10, B25B27/04, B25B27/18 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
B25B27/04 (EP);
B25B13/065 (EP);
B25B27/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2023/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERAUSZIEHEN UND LÖSEN VON BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENTEN | [2023/38] | English: | FASTENER EXTRACTOR AND DISLODGING TOOL APPARATUS | [2023/38] | French: | APPAREIL D'EXTRACTION ET DE DESSERRAGE D'ÉLÉMENT DE FIXATION | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 18.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19862898.4 / EP3837091 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1549041 (BERG OSCAR E) [A] 1-7 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0930132 (EAZYPOWER CORP [US]) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [A]US2009255384 (WHITEHEAD MICHAEL L [US]) [A] 1-7 * figures 8,10 *; | [XAI]CN203197845U (SHANXI SHENLONG ENERGY COKING CO LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 * [A] 2-4 [I] 5-7 |