EP4219782 - HIGH STRENGTH AND HIGH FORMABILITY STEEL SHEET AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26 Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Coralie 57320 RACRANGE / FR | 02 /
PERLADE, Astrid 57050 LE BAN-SAINT-MARTIN / FR | 03 /
ZHU, Kangying 57000 METZ / FR | 04 /
KEGEL, Frédéric 57970 YUTZ / FR | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23172244.8 | 18.12.2018 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | WO2017IB58122 | 19.12.2017 Original published format: PCT/IB2017/058122 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219782 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, C22C38/18, C22C38/38, C21D8/02, C21D8/04, C23C2/06, C21D9/46, C21D1/19, C23C2/02, C23C2/12, C23C2/28 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C22C38/00 (EP);
B23K11/10 (RU);
C22C38/38 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
B23K11/16 (US);
B32B15/012 (US);
B32B15/013 (US);
C21D1/19 (EP);
C21D6/002 (US);
C21D6/005 (US);
C21D6/008 (US);
C21D8/02 (RU);
C21D8/0205 (KR,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US);
C21D8/0236 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0263 (KR,US);
C21D8/0273 (KR);
C22C38/001 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,RU);
C22C38/18 (EP);
C22C38/22 (KR,US);
C22C38/24 (KR,US);
C22C38/26 (KR,US);
C22C38/28 (KR,US);
C22C38/32 (KR,US);
C22C38/34 (KR);
C23C2/02 (EP,RU,US);
C23C2/0224 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C23C2/024 (KR);
C23C2/06 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/12 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/29 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C23C2/40 (US);
B23K2101/006 (US);
C21D2211/001 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Validation states | MA | 09.05.2023 | Title | German: | HOCHFESTES UND HOCHVERFORMBARES STAHLBLECH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/31] | English: | HIGH STRENGTH AND HIGH FORMABILITY STEEL SHEET AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2023/31] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE ET HAUTE FORMABILITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18833332.2 / EP3728670 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2757169 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-29 * page 3; example K; table 1 * * claim 13 * * paragraph [[0041]] - paragraph [[0055]] *; | [A]WO2015011547 (ARCELORMITTAL INVESTIGACIÓN DESARROLLO SL [ES]) [A] 1-29 * claim 18 ** claims 1, 10-16 *; | [Y]WO2017108959 (ARCELORMITTAL [LU]) [Y] 1-29 * page 15; example 1; table 1 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * page 18; table IV * * claim 25 * * claims 7,8 * * claim 14 * | by applicant | EP2757169 | WO2017108959 | - RIETVELD, H., "A profile refinement method for nuclear and magnetic structures", Journal of applied Crystallography, (19690000), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 65 - 71 | - D. J. DYSONB. HOLMES, "Effect of alloying additions on the lattice parameter austenite", Journal of the Iron and Steel Institute, (19700000), vol. 208, pages 469 - 474 |