EP4236481 - POWER OPTIMIZATIONS FOR TRANSMISSION OPPORTUNITY (TXOP) MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHATTAD, Kapil San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SUN, Jing San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
THYAGARAJAN, Ananta Narayanan San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23172283.6 | 26.03.2019 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | IN201841011089 | 26.03.2018 Original published format: IN201841011089 | US201916363654 | 25.03.2019 Original published format: US201916363654 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4236481 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4236481 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/232, H04W52/02, // H04W74/08, H04W72/566 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H04W52/0248 (EP,CN,US);
H04W16/14 (CN,US);
H04W72/12 (CN);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W72/232 (EP,CN);
H04W74/006 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSOPTIMIERUNGEN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSGELEGENHEITEN (TXOP) | [2023/35] | English: | POWER OPTIMIZATIONS FOR TRANSMISSION OPPORTUNITY (TXOP) MONITORING | [2023/35] | French: | OPTIMISATIONS DE PUISSANCE POUR SURVEILLANCE D'OPPORTUNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION (TXOP) | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 01.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19719663.7 / EP3777426 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - FUJITSU, "Discussion on time domain resource allocation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1712742 DISCUSSION ON TIME DOMAIN RESOURCE ALLOCATION FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CED, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051315555 [X] 1,3-6,8-15 * Discussion; page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3 * [Y] 2,7 | [YA] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "TxOP Frame Structure for NR unlicensed", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180217), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1802866 7.6.5 FRAME STRUCTURE FOR NR UNLICENSED, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F92/Docs/, (20180217), XP051398279 [Y] 2,7 * Preparation stage; page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3 * * TxOP Startin/Ending Positions; page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5 * [A] 1,3-6,8-15 | [A] - ZTE ET AL, "Discusssion on NR operation in unlicensed spectrum", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1701619 - 8.1.10 DISCUSSION ON NR OPERATION IN UNLICENSED SPECTRUM, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPO, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051208786 [A] 1-15 * Minimization of reservation signal with flexible TTI size setting; page 4, paragraph 5.1 - page 5; figure 1 * * Resource allocation; page 5, paragraph 5.2 * | [A] - APPLE INC, "NR Unlicensed Considerations", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180217), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1802287 NR UNLICENSED CONSIDERATIONS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F92/Docs/, (20180217), XP051397817 [A] 1-15 * Mini-slot and configurable search space monitoring; page 2, paragraph 2.2 * | [A] - ZTE ET AL, "Framework on potential solutions and techniques for NR-U", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180217), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1801466 - 7.6.4 FRAMEWORK ON POTENTIAL SOLUTIONS AND TECHNIQUES FOR NR-U, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F92/Docs/, (20180217), XP051397565 [A] 1-15 * High frequency / Beam-based LBT; page 3, paragraph 4.1.1 - page 4 * |