EP4354173 - METHOD AND DEVICE WITH OBJECT RECOGNITION FOR INFORMATION COLLECTED FROM MOVING OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jong-Sok 16678 Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Sungdo 16678 Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
KHANG, Seung Tae 16678 Suwon-si / KR | 04 /
JEON, Jinyong 16678 Suwon-si / KR | 05 /
CHO, Young Rae 16678 Suwon-si / KR | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 23172703.3 | 11.05.2023 | [2024/16] | Priority number, date | KR20220130450 | 12.10.2022 Original published format: KR 20220130450 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4354173 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4354173 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/295, G01S7/41, G01S13/46, G01S13/86, G01S13/87, G01S13/931, G01S17/46, G01S17/931, H04W4/46 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
G01S13/865 (EP,KR);
B60W40/02 (KR);
G06F18/214 (CN);
G01S13/931 (EP,KR,US);
B60W40/10 (KR);
G01S13/46 (EP);
G01S13/87 (EP);
G01S17/46 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP,KR);
G01S7/2955 (EP);
G01S7/417 (EP);
G06N3/0464 (CN);
G06N3/08 (CN,KR);
G06V10/82 (US);
G06V20/58 (US);
H04W4/46 (EP);
B60W2050/0005 (KR);
B60W2420/408 (KR);
B60W2554/20 (KR);
B60W2554/40 (KR);
B60W2556/65 (KR);
G01S13/42 (EP);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/86 (EP);
G01S2013/9316 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG MIT OBJEKTERKENNUNG FÜR VON EINEM SICH BEWEGENDEN OBJEKT GESAMMELTEN INFORMATIONEN | [2024/16] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE WITH OBJECT RECOGNITION FOR INFORMATION COLLECTED FROM MOVING OBJECT | [2024/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE D'OBJET POUR DES INFORMATIONS COLLECTÉES À PARTIR D'UN OBJET MOBILE | [2024/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2019294966 (KHAN MALIK [AU], et al); | [XI]US2019391235 (HARRISON MATTHEW PAUL [US]); |