EP4234882 - CUTTING DEVICE WITH WEAR ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joy Global Underground Mining LLC 40 Pennwood Place, Suite 100 Warrendale, PA 15086 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE SOUSA, Joaquim Antonio Soares 1448 Alberton Gauteng / ZA | 02 /
LAING, Michael 1448 Alberton Gauteng / ZA | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23173937.6 | 26.05.2017 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | US201662342438P | 27.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662342438 P | US201662342254P | 27.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662342254 P | US201762446799P | 16.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762446799 P | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4234882 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4234882 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/12, E21C35/24, E21C25/06, E21C35/00, E21C25/18, E21C25/00, E21C27/24, E21C25/16, E21D9/11, E21D9/10 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
E02F9/2866 (EP,US);
E21C25/06 (RU,US);
E21C25/16 (CN,RU);
E21C27/20 (RU,US);
E21C25/18 (EP,RU,US);
E21C27/02 (EP,US);
E21C27/24 (RU);
E21C35/18 (CN,RU);
E21C35/1837 (RU,US);
E21C35/19 (CN);
E21D9/102 (US);
B26D2001/0046 (US);
E02F5/18 (EP,US);
E02F5/20 (US);
E21B3/02 (US);
E21B3/03 (US);
E21C27/16 (US);
E21C31/02 (US);
E21D9/1013 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | E21D9/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHNEIDVORRICHTUNG MIT VERSCHLEISSELEMENTEN | [2023/35] | English: | CUTTING DEVICE WITH WEAR ELEMENTS | [2023/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPE À ÉLÉMENTS D'USURE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 05.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17803673.7 / EP3463777 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2121202 (KILLGORE ROBERT J); | [A]GB1479374 (BOART HARDMETALS LTD); | [A]JPH11223090 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD); | [A]US6343842 (SAUER KLAUS DIETER [DE], et al); | [XA]WO03001031 (SANDVIK AB [SE], et al); | [A]US2009322143 (KRAUTER DAVID [US]); | [A]US2014251696 (COX EDWIN SEAN [US]) | by applicant | US7934776 | US2014077578 |