Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4236211 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4236211



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 669
05.03.2025 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.03.2025 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.03.2025 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.03.2025 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.03.2025 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 96
05.03.2025 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 96
30.01.2025 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.11.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.11.2023 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
27.11.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
27.11.2023 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 55
27.11.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 68
27.11.2023 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
27.11.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.09.2023 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
23.08.2023 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
18.08.2023 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.08.2023 European search opinion Search / examination 9
18.08.2023 European search report Search / examination 2
18.08.2023 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
02.08.2023 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.05.2023 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.05.2023 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
17.05.2023 Claims Search / examination 2
17.05.2023 Description Search / examination 65
17.05.2023 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
17.05.2023 Drawings Search / examination 39
17.05.2023 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.05.2023 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
23.12.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 121
23.12.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 76