EP4296191 - PACKAGE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MULTIVAC Marking & Inspection GmbH & Co. KG Kupferweg 5 32130 Enger / DE | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REFFKE, Michael 32289 Rödinghausen / DE | 02 /
HELMEL, Ronald 9871 Seeboden / AT | 03 /
SCHRÖDER, Tobias 32130 Enger / DE | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23174428.5 | 22.05.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | DE202210114394 | 08.06.2022 Original published format: DE102022114394 | [2023/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296191 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/20, B32B3/14, B65B7/28, B65H35/10 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B65D77/2024 (EP,US);
B65B7/162 (EP);
B65C9/1869 (US);
B65C9/26 (US);
B65D1/34 (US);
B65D17/502 (US);
B65D51/1611 (US);
B65D51/245 (US);
B65H23/1882 (EP);
B65D2203/02 (EP,US);
B65D2205/02 (US);
B65D2577/205 (US);
B65H2301/4132 (EP);
B65H2553/41 (EP);
B65H2701/194 (EP);
B65H2801/81 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] |
Former [2023/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER VERPACKUNG | [2023/52] | English: | PACKAGE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PACKAGE | [2023/52] | French: | EMBALLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN EMBALLAGE | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3924748 (BRAVERMAN MILTON) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 32 - column 6, line 27 ** figures 1-10 *; | [Y]KR200309073Y (SUJA KWON) [Y] 7 * page 2 - page 4 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XYI]US2018111736 (NAPIERALA II ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,10 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 1-9 * [Y] 7 [I] 6,9; | [XI]US10994891 (BRAVERMAN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * column 4, line 4 - column 8, line 53 * * figures 1-11 * [I] 9 | by applicant | EP2666728 |