EP4282643 - COMPOSITE BODY PART COMPRISING METAL FILAMENTS FOR A ROAD VEHICLE, RELATIVE ROAD VEHICLE AND RELATIVE PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERRARI S.p.A. Via Emilia Est, 1163 41100 Modena / IT | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMEI, Stefano 41100 MODENA / IT | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/48] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 23174502.7 | 22.05.2023 | [2023/48] | Priority number, date | IT20220010733 | 24.05.2022 Original published format: IT202200010733 | [2023/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4282643 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B5/10, B32B5/12, B32B5/24, B32B5/26, B32B7/02, B32B7/12, B62D25/06 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
B62D25/06 (EP,CN,US);
B62D29/043 (CN,US);
B29C69/00 (CN);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/10 (EP);
B32B5/12 (EP);
B32B5/245 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP);
B32B5/262 (EP,US);
B32B7/02 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B60R13/0212 (CN);
B60R13/0815 (CN);
B62D27/026 (EP);
B62D29/004 (US);
B62D29/04 (EP);
B29L2031/30 (CN);
B32B2250/05 (EP);
B32B2255/02 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2262/103 (US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,US);
B32B2262/128 (US);
B32B2262/148 (EP);
B32B2266/08 (US);
B32B2305/022 (US);
B32B2305/188 (US);
B32B2307/102 (US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
B32B2307/7376 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] |
Former [2023/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDKAROSSERIETEIL MIT METALLFILAMENTEN FÜR EIN STRASSENFAHRZEUG, ZUGEHÖRIGES STRASSENFAHRZEUG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/48] | English: | COMPOSITE BODY PART COMPRISING METAL FILAMENTS FOR A ROAD VEHICLE, RELATIVE ROAD VEHICLE AND RELATIVE PRODUCTION METHOD | [2023/48] | French: | PIÈCE DE CARROSSERIE COMPOSITE COMPRENANT DES FILAMENTS MÉTALLIQUES POUR UN VÉHICULE ROUTIER, VÉHICULE ROUTIER CORRESPONDANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ | [2023/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN109823012 (ZHEJIANG HUAJIANG TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * example 1 ** claim 1 *; | [Y]KR20200030772 (LG HAUSYS LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0076] * * page 1; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2021023830 (DODWORTH ANTONY [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0162] * * figure 1 * * claim 11 *; | [Y] - Composite Envisions, "Copper Reflections Carbon Fiber Fabric 2x2 Twill 3k 50''/127cm 5.9oz/200gsm", (20170726), URL: https://compositeenvisions.com/product/copper-reflections-carbon-fiber-fabric-2x2-twill-3k-50-127cm-5-9oz-200gsm/, (20221213), XP093007504 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * |