EP4220888 - METHOD FOR FEEDING ELECTRICAL POWER INTO AN ELECTRICAL SUPPLY NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Borsigstraße 26 26607 Aurich / DE | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brombach, Johannes 13437 Berlin / DE | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23175275.9 | 27.01.2017 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | DE201610101469 | 27.01.2016 Original published format: DE102016101469 | [2023/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4220888 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4220888 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/46, F03D7/02, H02J3/38, // H02J3/24 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
F03D7/0284 (EP,KR,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,KR,US);
H02J3/24 (KR);
H02J3/38 (US);
H02J3/46 (EP,KR,US);
F05B2270/335 (EP,KR,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,KR,US);
H02J3/241 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/76 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINSPEISEN ELEKTRISCHER LEISTUNG IN EIN ELEKTRISCHES VERSORGUNGSNETZ | [2023/31] | English: | METHOD FOR FEEDING ELECTRICAL POWER INTO AN ELECTRICAL SUPPLY NETWORK | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INJECTION DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE DISTRIBUTION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17701869.4 / EP3408914 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03077398 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]); | [X]WO2010108910 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE], et al); | [A]DE102011006670 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]); | [A]DE102012212366 (WOBBEN PROPERTIES GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2014103655 (BURRA RANJI KANT [IN], et al); | [X]DE102013203540 (SENVION SE [DE]); | by applicant | WO9933165 | US2003155773 | US2006142899 | US2011074151 | WO2014121794 | US2014316592 | EP1790850 |