Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
22.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
22.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
22.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.09.2023 | Publication of search report | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
01.09.2023 | Change - classification | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
28.07.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
26.05.2023 | Change - representative | |
26.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |