Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022026077 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US202117332533 | 27.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021126451 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019013910 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024008972 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318470936 | 20.09.2023 | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US202117332533 | 27.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022280283 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | US202117342215 | 08.06.2021 | US201916398627 | 30.04.2019 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | US202217751555 | 23.05.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11938018 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2024 | B2 | US2021282920 | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017011975 | 03.09.2020 | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US201916398627 | 30.04.2019 | US202117332577 | 27.05.2021 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | US201816190959 | 14.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11903818 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2024 | B2 | US2022000606 | 06.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US202017011975 | 03.09.2020 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | US202117479427 | 20.09.2021 | US201816190959 | 14.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11864991 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2024 | B2 | US2022031448 | 03.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US202117332533 | 27.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11583386 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2023 | B2 | US2021290369 | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | US202117342215 | 08.06.2021 | US201916398627 | 30.04.2019 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11571293 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2023 | B2 | US2021290370 | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | US201916398627 | 30.04.2019 | US202117342246 | 08.06.2021 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11432921 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2022 | B2 | US2020397562 | 24.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US202017011975 | 03.09.2020 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | US201816190959 | 14.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11109957 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2021 | B2 | US2020121446 | 23.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | US201916398627 | 30.04.2019 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10945832 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2021 | B2 | US2019254808 | 22.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | US201916398627 | 30.04.2019 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10842614 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2020 | B2 | US2019076237 | 14.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | US201816190959 | 14.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10299910 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | B2 | US2017304045 | 26.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240131459 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20237028004 | 07.06.2018 | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240046286 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | KR20227038159 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230042216 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021US37911 | 17.06.2021 | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US202117332533 | 27.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220117195 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US61099 | 18.11.2020 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102697891B | Global Dossier | 22.08.2024 | B1 | KR20230128130 | 01.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | KR20227004439 | 07.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102652996B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2024 | B1 | KR20220151230 | 14.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | KR20177008836 | 22.09.2015 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102569508B | Global Dossier | 22.08.2023 | B1 | KR20220025190 | 03.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | KR20217018671 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102463039B | Global Dossier | 07.11.2022 | B1 | KR20170058951 | 29.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102387677B | Global Dossier | 18.04.2022 | B1 | KR20210084637 | 07.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20197037303 | 07.06.2018 | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102277674B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2021 | B1 | KR20200022385 | 03.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024053062 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | JP2022211180 | 28.12.2022 | JP2021085035 | 20.05.2021 | JP2020066515 | 02.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024029029 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020501359 | 07.06.2018 | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | JP2022170709 | 25.10.2022 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023536232 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021US37911 | 17.06.2021 | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US202117332533 | 27.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023508122 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US61099 | 18.11.2020 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7457408B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2024 | B2 | JP2023030165 | 07.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | JP2021085035 | 20.05.2021 | JP2020066515 | 02.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7412033B | Global Dossier | 12.01.2024 | B2 | JP2023017812 | 07.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020501359 | 07.06.2018 | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7210058B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2023 | B2 | JP2021118972 | 12.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | JP2020066515 | 02.04.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7193164B | Global Dossier | 20.12.2022 | B2 | JP2020526336 | 31.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6892164B | Global Dossier | 23.06.2021 | B2 | JP2020114450 | 30.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017535622 | 22.09.2015 | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6712371B | Global Dossier | 24.06.2020 | B2 | JP2017528300 | 28.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4132422 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2024 | A4 | EP4132422 | 15.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021US37911 | 17.06.2021 | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US202117332533 | 27.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4076280 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2024 | A4 | EP4076280 | 26.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US61099 | 18.11.2020 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3888595 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18831320 | 07.06.2018 | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3865092 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2023 | C0 | EP3865092 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2023 | B1 | EP3865092 | 18.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | EP15845158 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3651693 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2021 | B1 | EP3651693 | 25.11.2020 | A4 | EP3651693 | 20.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3197396 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2021 | B1 | EP3197396 | 04.04.2018 | A4 | EP3197396 | 02.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115835834 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021US37911 | 17.06.2021 | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US202117332533 | 27.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114667116 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US61099 | 18.11.2020 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113558818B | Global Dossier | 24.05.2024 | B | CN113558818 | 29.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110736155 | 07.06.2018 | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | CN201880046413 | 07.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113558817B | Global Dossier | 13.08.2024 | B | CN113558817 | 29.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110735275 | 07.06.2018 | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | CN201880046413 | 07.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113545888B | Global Dossier | 13.08.2024 | B | CN113545888 | 26.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | CN201880046413 | 07.06.2018 | CN202110736206 | 07.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110913800B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2021 | B | CN110913800 | 24.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3177409 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021US37911 | 17.06.2021 | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US202117332533 | 27.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3158931 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2024 | C | CA3158931 | 31.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | CA2961543 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3148157 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US61099 | 18.11.2020 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3065541 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2961543 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2022 | C | CA2961543 | 31.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2023202336B | Global Dossier | 05.09.2024 | B2 | AU2023202336 | 11.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019204613 | 28.06.2019 | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | AU2023202336 | 17.04.2023 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | AU2015321522 | 22.09.2015 | AU2021245264 | 11.10.2021 | AU2020239672 | 23.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2023200236B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2024 | B2 | AU2023200236 | 16.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2023200236 | 18.01.2023 | AU2018301248 | 07.06.2018 | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | AU2021200835 | 10.02.2021 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | AU2021225123 | 30.08.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021315853 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021US37911 | 17.06.2021 | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US202117332533 | 27.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021245264B | Global Dossier | 02.02.2023 | B2 | AU2021245264 | 04.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019204613 | 28.06.2019 | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | AU2015321522 | 22.09.2015 | AU2021245264 | 11.10.2021 | AU2020239672 | 23.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021225123B | Global Dossier | 23.02.2023 | B2 | AU2021225123 | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018301248 | 07.06.2018 | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | AU2021200835 | 10.02.2021 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | AU2021225123 | 30.08.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021200835B | Global Dossier | 30.09.2021 | B2 | AU2021200835 | 04.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018301248 | 07.06.2018 | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | AU2021200835 | 10.02.2021 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020409129 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020US61099 | 18.11.2020 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020239672B | Global Dossier | 09.09.2021 | B2 | AU2020239672 | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019204613 | 28.06.2019 | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | AU2015321522 | 22.09.2015 | AU2020239672 | 23.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019204613B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2020 | B2 | AU2019204613 | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019204613 | 28.06.2019 | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | AU2015321522 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018301248B | Global Dossier | 20.05.2021 | B2 | AU2018301248 | 02.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015321522C | Global Dossier | 01.08.2019 | C1 | AU2015321522B | 30.05.2019 | B2 | AU2015321522 | 06.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4233809 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2023 | A3 | EP4233809 | 30.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | EP21161655 | 22.09.2015 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | EP15845158 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2876294T | 12.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2894270T | 14.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017003760 | 23.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020000415 | 24.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022006993 | 13.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020US61099 | 18.11.2020 | US201916717304 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023001223 | 03.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021US37911 | 17.06.2021 | US202063057738 | 28.07.2020 | US202117332533 | 27.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2024001164 | 27.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2024001166 | 27.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2024001168 | 27.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ729994 | 30.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | WO2015US51415 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ755995 | 30.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | NZ72999415 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ759770 | 26.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US36519 | 07.06.2018 | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ767865 | 25.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | NZ75599515 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ767870 | 25.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | NZ75599515 | 22.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ772895 | 27.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715646254 | 11.07.2017 | NZ75977018 | 07.06.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016049005 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10159562 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2018 | B2 | US2016081791 | 24.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2952638T | 02.11.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022010716 | 29.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514860629 | 21.09.2015 | US201462053771 | 22.09.2014 | Type | Earlier application | EP3197396 | EP3865092 |