Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
29.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] |
29.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] |
01.09.2023 | Publication of search report | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
01.09.2023 | Change - classification | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
01.09.2023 | Change - classification | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
22.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.07.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
29.05.2023 | Change - representative |