Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230117335 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | IT202000024202 | 14.10.2020 | WO2021IB59445 | 14.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230117128 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | IT202000024202 | 14.10.2020 | WO2021IB59445 | 14.10.2021 | KR20237015932 | 14.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023546397 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | IT202000024202 | 14.10.2020 | WO2021IB59445 | 14.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023159890 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | IT202000024202 | 14.10.2020 | JP2023522890 | 14.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4214117 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT202000024202 | 14.10.2020 | WO2021IB59445 | 14.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117022621 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | IT202000024202 | 14.10.2020 | WO2021IB59445 | 14.10.2021 | CN202180083790 | 14.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116635296 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | IT202000024202 | 14.10.2020 | WO2021IB59445 | 14.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4234392 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2023 | A3 | EP4234392 | 30.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IT202000024202 | 14.10.2020 | EP21798787 | 14.10.2021 | WO2021IB59445 | 14.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022079651 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT202000024202 | 14.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT202000024202 | 14.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT202000024202 | 14.10.2020 | Type | Earlier application | EP4214117 |