EP4248952 - CONTROLLED RELEASE 25-HYDROXYVITAMIN D [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EirGen Pharma Ltd. Westside Business Park Old Kilmeaden Road Waterford X91 YV67 / IE | For all designated states Opko Renal, LLC 4400 Biscayne Boulevard Miami, FL 33137 / US | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bishop, Charles W. Miami, 33130 / US | 02 /
Tabash, Samir P. Ontario, L1R 2Z9 / CA | 03 /
Agudoawu, Sammy A. Ontario, L5M 0C5 / CA | 04 /
White, Jay A. Ontario, L3X 1T3 / CA | 05 /
Crawford, Keith H. Parker, 80138 / US | 06 /
Messner, Eric J. Illinois, 60045 / US | 07 /
Petkovich, P. Martin Ontario, K7M 4E8 / CA | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 23175825.1 | 25.04.2008 | [2023/39] | Priority number, date | US200791385307P | 25.04.2007 Original published format: US 91385307 P | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4248952 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K31/593, A61K47/06, A61K47/14, A61K47/44 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
A61K9/4858 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/593 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/48 (KR,US);
A61K31/59 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K47/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K9/0019 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/4825 (KR,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KONTROLLIERTE FREISETZUNG 25-HYDROXYVITAMIN D | [2023/39] | English: | CONTROLLED RELEASE 25-HYDROXYVITAMIN D | [2023/39] | French: | LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE DE 25-HYDROXYVITAMINE D | [2023/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 27.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08746908.6 / EP2148661 | EP12154573.5 / EP2481400 | EP14166756.8 / EP2762132 | EP19172946.6 / EP3542792 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9112807 (LEO PHARM PROD LTD [DK]) [X] 1-15 * examples 2,3 *; | [Y]WO03039521 (FARMATRON LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15* example 4; claim 5 *; | [Y]WO03047595 (NOVACEA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim 45; table 3 *; | [X]US2004101554 (KIRSCHNER MITCHELL I [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * example 2; table II * | by applicant | - "Kidney Disease Outcomes Quality Initiative (K/DOQI) Clinical Practice Guidelines for Bone Metabolism and Disease in Chronic Kidney Disease", Am. J. Kidney Dis., (20030000), vol. 42, pages S1 - S202 | - "National Kidney Foundation guidelines, NKF", Am. J. Kidney Dis., (20030000), vol. 42, pages S1 - S202 |