EP4290264 - MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING APPARATUS, AND MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 20.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 20.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [2024/43] |
Former [2023/50] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Healthcare Corporation 2-1, Shintoyofuta Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 277-0804 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOSAWA, Suguru Kashiwa-shi, Chiba, 277-0804 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Atsuro Kashiwa-shi, Chiba, 277-0804 / JP | 03 /
SHIRAI, Toru Kashiwa-shi, Chiba, 277-0804 / JP | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 23176705.4 | 01.06.2023 | [2023/50] | Priority number, date | JP20220093909 | 09.06.2022 Original published format: JP 2022093909 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4290264 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/56, G01R33/54, G16H30/20, G16H30/40, G16H50/20 | [2024/43] | CPC: |
G01R33/5608 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G01R33/543 (EP);
G06T5/50 (US);
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G06T2200/24 (US);
G06T2207/10081 (US);
G06T2207/10088 (US);
G06T2207/10132 (US);
G06T2207/20092 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/50] | G01R33/56, G01R33/54, G16H30/20, G16H30/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG MEDIZINISCHER BILDER, VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIAGNOSTISCHEN BILDGEBUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG MEDIZINISCHER BILDER | [2023/50] | English: | MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING APPARATUS, AND MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2023/50] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE MÉDICALE, APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE DE DIAGNOSTIC ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE MÉDICALE | [2023/50] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 10.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2011110572 (GUEHRING JENS [US], et al); | [X]EP3187891 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]US9805470 (BHATIA VIVEK NARESH [US], et al); | [A]US2021042913 (TAKESHIMA HIDENORI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2021027891 |