EP4293692 - SOLID ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR WITH IMPROVED RELIABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kemet Electronics Corporation One East Broward Blvd., 5th Floor Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 / US | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bunha, Ajaykumar Simpsonville 29681 / US | 02 /
Chacko, Antony P Simpsonville 29681 / US | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/51] | Goodman, Simon John Nye Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 23176742.7 | 01.06.2023 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US202217831138 | 02.06.2022 Original published format: US202217831138 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293692 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/00, H01G9/028, H01G9/15, // H01G9/07 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H01G9/0036 (EP);
H01G9/028 (EP);
H01G9/15 (EP);
H01G9/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] |
Former [2023/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYTKONDENSATOR MIT VERBESSERTER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT | [2023/51] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR WITH IMPROVED RELIABILITY | [2023/51] | French: | CONDENSATEUR À ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE À FIABILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/30] | 19.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006044736 (TAKETANI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2010053847 (TANI TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0097]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2011188173 (OTA TAEKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0171]; figure 1; examples 1-12; comparative examples 2,8 *; | [A]US2012218681 (KOSUGE KEIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *; | [A]US2014313638 (KATO TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0090]; figures 1-3; example 1; claims 1-7 *; | [Y]US2019006110 (YAMAGUCHI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0085]; figure Figure; example 1 * | by applicant | US8882856 | US9761347 | US9761378 | US9793058 | US10109428 | US10643796 | - FREEMAN et al., J. Solid State Sci. Technol., (20130000), vol. 2, pages N197 - N204 | - FREEMAN et al., Appl. Sci., (20210000), vol. 11, page 5514 |