EP4233605 - SUPPORT GARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDT, Baron C. Beaverton, 97005 / US | 02 /
GROGRO, Daniela Beaverton, 97005 / US | 03 /
KOSHKAROFF, Iustinia Beaverton, 97005 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23176932.4 | 23.02.2018 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | US201762463286P | 24.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762463286 P | US201815901651 | 21.02.2018 Original published format: US201815901651 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4233605 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4233605 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A41C3/00 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
A41C3/0057 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A41C3/0021 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A41C3/08 (CN,US);
A41C3/12 (CN,US);
A41C3/122 (KR);
A41D7/00 (US);
B32B5/24 (CN,US);
A41D2400/00 (KR,US);
A41D2500/30 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STÜTZBEKLEIDUNG | [2023/35] | English: | SUPPORT GARMENT | [2023/35] | French: | VÊTEMENT DE SOUTIEN | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 07.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18709889.2 / EP3585193 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007123145 (CHANG CHEN-FU [TW], et al) |