EP4335638 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A FIBROUS PRODUCT AND A FIBROUS PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paptic OY Tekniikantie 2 D 02150 Espoo / FI | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINNUNEN-RAUDASKOSKI, Karita 02150 Espoo / FI | 02 /
JUVONEN, Marja 02150 Espoo / FI | 03 /
TORNIAINEN, Esa 02150 Espoo / FI | 04 /
HÄGGBLOM, Martin 02150 Espoo / FI | 05 /
MUSTONEN, Tuomas 02150 Espoo / FI | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 23177598.2 | 31.12.2018 | [2024/11] | Priority number, date | FI20170006206 | 31.12.2017 Original published format: FI 20176206 | [2024/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4335638 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4335638 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/12, B32B29/00, B32B5/18, B32B5/24, B32B5/32, B32B25/02, B32B25/04, B32B25/14 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
B32B29/005 (EP);
D21F11/002 (FI,US);
B32B5/18 (EP,FI,KR);
D21H17/34 (FI,US);
B32B25/02 (EP);
B32B25/042 (EP);
B32B25/045 (EP);
B32B25/14 (EP);
B32B27/00 (FI);
B32B29/00 (EP);
B32B29/007 (EP,FI);
B32B29/04 (FI);
B32B5/245 (EP,KR);
B32B5/32 (EP,KR);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR);
B65D65/38 (FI);
C08J9/228 (FI);
D21H13/30 (FI,US);
D21H13/32 (FI,US);
D21H13/38 (FI,US);
D21H13/40 (FI,US);
D21H17/20 (FI,US);
D21H17/33 (US);
D21H17/37 (FI,US);
B32B2250/22 (EP);
B32B2260/021 (EP);
B32B2260/025 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2260/048 (EP);
B32B2262/02 (EP);
B32B2262/0223 (EP);
B32B2262/0261 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/0284 (EP);
B32B2262/06 (KR);
B32B2262/065 (EP);
B32B2262/12 (EP);
B32B2264/02 (EP);
B32B2264/0228 (EP);
B32B2264/0264 (EP);
B32B2264/0278 (EP);
B32B2264/0285 (EP);
B32B2264/065 (EP);
B32B2266/0207 (EP);
B32B2266/0221 (EP);
B32B2266/0242 (EP);
B32B2266/0278 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (EP);
B32B2307/50 (EP);
B32B2307/582 (EP);
B32B2307/7163 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP);
B32B2307/73 (EP);
B32B2307/7376 (EP);
B32B2307/756 (EP);
B32B2439/00 (EP);
B32B2439/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/11] | B32B25/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FASERPRODUKTS UND FASERPRODUKT | [2024/11] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A FIBROUS PRODUCT AND A FIBROUS PRODUCT | [2024/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT FIBREUX ET PRODUIT FIBREUX | [2024/11] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18833906.3 / EP3732040 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19719807 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2006032596 (LESKELA MARKKU [FI], et al); | [XI]JP2009046199 (SCHOELLER & HOESCH PAPIERFAB); | [XYI]WO2015176063 (FIRST QUALITY TISSUE LLC [US]); | [Y]WO2017203101 (PAPTIC OY [FI]) | by applicant | FI126474 | FI126092B | FI126474B |