EP4296637 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BANDWIDTH EXTENSION OF A CONTINUOUS WAVE PHOTONIC SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Darmstadt Karolinenplatz 5 64289 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preu, Sascha 64367 Mühltal / DE | 02 /
Mukherjee, Amlan Kusum 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | LifeTech IP Spies & Behrndt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Elsenheimerstraße 47a 80687 München / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23179319.1 | 14.06.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | DE202210115387 | 21.06.2022 Original published format: DE102022115387 | [2023/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296637 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/42, G01N21/3581, G01R23/167 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G01J3/42 (EP);
G01R23/167 (EP);
G01N21/3581 (EP);
G01R23/163 (EP);
G01R23/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2023/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BANDBREITENERWEITE-RUNG EINES PHOTONISCHEN DAUERSTRICH-SPEKTROMETERS | [2023/52] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BANDWIDTH EXTENSION OF A CONTINUOUS WAVE PHOTONIC SPECTROMETER | [2023/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉALISATION D'EXTENSION DE BANDE PASSANTE DE SPECTROMÈTRE PHOTONIQUE À ONDE CONTINUE | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/32] | 27.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017307520 (HEPP CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 12] , [0 17] - [0019] *; | [X] - FRIEDERICH B ET AL, "Preprocessing for Robust Estimation of Material Parameters by Continuous Wave THz Spectroscopy", 2018 43RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFRARED, MILLIMETER, AND TERAHERTZ WAVES (IRMMW-THZ), IEEE, (20180909), doi:10.1109/IRMMW-THZ.2018.8510417, pages 1 - 2, XP033430923 [X] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IRMMW-THz.2018.8510417 | [X] - JIAO YUFENG ET AL, "Research on Dielectric Constants of Non-polar Liquid and Mixture with Terahertz Frequency-domain Spectroscopy", 2021 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MICROWAVE AND MILLIMETER WAVE TECHNOLOGY (ICMMT), IEEE, (20210523), doi:10.1109/ICMMT52847.2021.9618626, pages 1 - 3, XP034034105 [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * chapter above Fig. 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICMMT52847.2021.9618626 |