EP4321287 - ELECTRIC MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mafell AG Beffendorfer Strasse 4 78727 Oberndorf a.N. / DE | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUS, Felix 78655 Dunningen Seedorf / DE | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 23179445.4 | 15.06.2023 | [2024/07] | Priority number, date | DE202210115896 | 27.06.2022 Original published format: DE102022115896 | [2024/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4321287 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B23D45/04, B23D47/02, B27B5/20 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
B23D45/04 (EP);
B23D47/02 (EP);
B27B5/208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/37] |
Former [2024/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE BEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE | [2024/07] | English: | ELECTRIC MACHINE TOOL | [2024/07] | French: | MACHINE D'USINAGE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2024/07] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/37] | 05.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4123435 (RYOBY LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10,13-15 * column 14, line 40 - column 15, line 11; figures 1,25-28 * [Y] 11,12; | [XY]DE4136441 (DANGO & DIENENTHAL MASCHBAU [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim - *[Y] 11,12 | by applicant | DE102019129535 |