Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP4235241

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure10.06.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2024/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.202406   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:28.07.2023 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:28.07.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE APPLICATION HAS BEEN PUBLISHED
 
Event date:30.08.2023 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:3788348
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:30.08.2023 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:13.10.2023 
Event description:SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013
 
Event date:12.10.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G02B0006380000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N0021880000
 
Event date:15.11.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G02B 6/38 20060101ALN20231012BHEP
 
Event date:15.11.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 21/88 20060101AFI20231012BHEP
 
Event date:15.11.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 21/94 20060101ALI20231012BHEP
 
Event date:15.11.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06T 7/00 20170101ALI20231012BHEP
 
Event date:15.11.2023 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:13.09.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE APPLICATION IS DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
 
Event date:16.10.2024 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20240516