EP4233736 - MEDICAL IMPLANT DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rotation Medical, Inc. 15350 25th Avenue N. Suite 100 Plymouth, MN 55447 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENZ-OLSON, Nathaniel Plymouth, 55447 / US | 02 /
TRAN, Nathaniel Plymouth, 55447 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23179635.0 | 05.05.2016 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | US201562157674P | 06.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562157674 P | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4233736 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4233736 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61F2/00, A61B17/00 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A61B17/3468 (EP);
A61B17/56 (US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61F2/0805 (EP);
A61B2017/564 (US);
A61F2002/0072 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR EINFÜHRUNG EINES MEDIZINISCHEN IMPLANTATS | [2023/35] | English: | MEDICAL IMPLANT DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2023/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE POSE D'IMPLANT MÉDICAL | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 27.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16727001.6 / EP3291750 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5405360 (TOVEY H JONATHAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** column 3, line 50 - column 8, line 32; figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP1114618 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0040] , [ 0043] - [0044] - [ 0049]; figures 5-8 *; | [A]US2008294174 (BARDSLEY EARL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0039]; figures 3-5 *; | [A]EP2097021 (SENORX INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [ 0028]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US2009299401 (TILSON ALEXANDER QUILLIN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0334] , [ 0531] , [ 0610]; figures 101-107 *; | [A]WO2011140382 (BIRSECT LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0018] - [ 0026] - [0027] - [ 0036] - [0038] - [ 0115] , [ 0117] - [0122]; figures 19-29 *; | [A]US8221440 (KULLAS KAREN E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 9, line 61 - column 10, line 22; figures 1-16 *; | [I]US2013172997 (EUTENEUER CHARLES L [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0023] - [0062] - [0076]; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | US5238004 | US6508803 | US20100684774 | US20100729029 | US20100794540 | US20100794551 | US20100794677 |