EP4296886 - ENROLLMENT ASSISTANCE DEVICE WITH CONDUCTOR SPIRAL, BIOMETRIC SYSTEM AND ENROLLMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fingerprint Cards Anacatum IP AB c/o Fingerprints Kungsgatan 20 411 19 Göteborg / SE | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMERSBERG, Johan 448 36 Floda / SE | 02 /
ASAD, Muhammad 463 71 Lödöse / SE | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23179930.5 | 19.06.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | SE20220050779 | 23.06.2022 Original published format: SE 2250779 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296886 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G06K19/07 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G06K7/10188 (EP);
G06K19/0727 (EP);
G06K7/10336 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGISTRIERUNGSHILFSVORRICHTUNG MIT LEITERSPIRALE, BIOMETRISCHES SYSTEM UND REGISTRIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/52] | English: | ENROLLMENT ASSISTANCE DEVICE WITH CONDUCTOR SPIRAL, BIOMETRIC SYSTEM AND ENROLLMENT METHOD | [2023/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIDE À L'INSCRIPTION AVEC SPIRALE CONDUCTRICE, SYSTÈME BIOMÉTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSCRIPTION | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 01.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2018294845 (BIMBAUD IGOR [FR], et al); | [Y]US11113593 (FINN DAVID [DE]) | by applicant | US2020327533 |