EP4233639 - ELECTRIC APPLIANCE FOR PERSONAL CARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trisa Holding AG Kantonsstrasse 31 6234 Triengen / CH | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bärtschi, Armin 4652 Winznau / CH | 02 /
Fischer, Herbert 5057 Reitnau / CH | 03 /
Schär, Michael 6243 Egolzwil / CH | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23180403.0 | 20.04.2016 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | EP20150166214 | 04.05.2015 Original published format: EP 15166214 | [2023/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4233639 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4233639 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04, A61C17/16 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A46B9/026 (EP,US);
A61C17/3481 (US);
A45D29/05 (EP,US);
A45D29/14 (EP,US);
A45D29/17 (EP,US);
A45D40/262 (US);
A46B13/008 (EP,US);
A46B13/023 (EP,US);
A46B5/0095 (EP,US);
A46B9/028 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (EP,US);
A46B9/06 (EP,US);
A47K7/04 (EP,US);
A61C15/047 (EP,US);
A61C15/048 (EP,US);
A61C17/16 (EP,US);
A61C17/32 (EP,US);
B26B21/38 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1053 (US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
A46B2200/108 (EP,US);
A61C15/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | A46B9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROGERÄT FÜR DIE KÖRPERPFLEGE | [2023/35] | English: | ELECTRIC APPLIANCE FOR PERSONAL CARE | [2023/35] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTRIQUE DE SOINS CORPORELS | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 23.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16721689.4 / EP3291763 | EP19165630.5 / EP3542667 | EP21181032.0 / EP3928659 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6546585 (BLAUSTEIN LAWRENCE A [US], et al); | [XY]EP1790312 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]US2013000061 (PARK JONG CHAN [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2013076904 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [XY]WO2013132363 (TELEFIELD LTD [CN]) | by applicant | US3088148 | US3369265 | DE1632389 | US3685080 | US5365627 | WO2008130246 | WO2011073848 | WO2014169398 | US2015034113 |