EP4297436 - A HEARING AID COMPRISING AN ACTIVE OCCLUSION CANCELLATION SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 05.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Karsten Bo 3460 Birkerød / DK | 02 /
PETERSEN, Svend Oscar DK-2765 Smørum / DK | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Demant Demant A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23180655.5 | 21.06.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | EP20220181057 | 24.06.2022 Original published format: EP 22181057 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4297436 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, G10K11/178, G10K11/22, // H04R1/10 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04R25/505 (EP);
H04R25/50 (CN);
H04R25/453 (US);
G10K11/17817 (EP);
G10K11/17825 (EP);
G10K11/17861 (EP);
G10K11/17881 (EP);
G10K11/22 (EP);
G10K2210/116 (EP);
G10K2210/30232 (EP);
G10K2210/3216 (EP);
G10K2210/506 (EP);
H04R1/1016 (EP);
H04R1/1091 (EP);
H04R2225/021 (US);
H04R2225/0216 (EP);
H04R2225/025 (EP,US);
H04R2225/43 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2023/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÖRGERÄT MIT EINEM AKTIVEN OKKLUSIONSUNTERDRÜCKUNGSSYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDE METHODE | [2023/52] | English: | A HEARING AID COMPRISING AN ACTIVE OCCLUSION CANCELLATION SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2023/52] | French: | PROTHÈSE AUDITIVE COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME D'ANNULATION D'OCCLUSION ACTIF ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/32] | 27.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008123866 (RULE ELIZABETH L [CA], et al); | [YDA]EP3588985 (GN HEARING AS [DK]); | [YD]EP3588981 (OTICON AS [DK]); | by applicant | US2008063228 | US8229127 | EP3588981 | EP3588985 |