EP4296913 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT AND SUSTAINABILITY SCORE OF A FOOD ITEM USING A FOOD INGREDIENT REPOSITORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nutritics Limited 22C Town Center Mall Main Street Swords Dublin / IE | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O KELLY, Damian Swords / IE | 02 /
O KELLY, Ciaran Swords / IE | 03 /
HOGEN, Sinead Swords / IE | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/52] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 23180704.1 | 21.06.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | US202263353861P | 21.06.2022 Original published format: US 202263353861 P | US202318211818 | 20.06.2023 Original published format: US202318211818 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296913 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q10/08, G06Q10/0832, G06Q10/0833, G06Q10/0835 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP);
A23L33/40 (US);
G06Q10/08 (EP);
G06Q10/0832 (EP);
G06Q10/0833 (EP);
G06Q10/0835 (EP);
G06Q20/1235 (US);
G06Q20/389 (US);
G06Q30/0206 (US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/31] |
Former [2023/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 25.06.2024 | Validation states | KH | 25.06.2024 | MA | 25.06.2024 | MD | 25.06.2024 | TN | 25.06.2024 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER UMWELTBELASTUNG UND NACHHALTIGKEITSWERTUNG EINES LEBENSMITTELARTIKELS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES LEBENSMITTELINHALTSSTOFFSPEICHERS | [2023/52] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT AND SUSTAINABILITY SCORE OF A FOOD ITEM USING A FOOD INGREDIENT REPOSITORY | [2023/52] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER LE SCORE D'IMPACT ENVIRONNEMENTAL ET DE DURABILITÉ D'UN ALIMENT À L'AIDE D'UN DÉPÔT D'INGRÉDIENTS ALIMENTAIRES | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/31] | 25.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2021004739 (GILL JAGJEET [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2021287275 (KARLAN-MASON GALEN G [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * the whole document * |