EP4306916 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR WEIGHING INDIVIDUAL CONTAINERS AND A SET COMPRISING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | 15.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syntegon Technology GmbH Stuttgarter Straße 130 71332 Waiblingen / DE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krauß, Ulrich 74532 Ilshofen / DE | 02 /
Nagler, Stefan 73485 Unterschneidheim / DE | 03 /
Ilgenfritz, Markus 91555 Feuchtwangen / DE | 04 /
Bertram, Selig 74564 Crailsheim / DE | 05 /
Hillenmeyer, Erich 73479 Ellwangen / DE | 06 /
Stegmeier, Samuel 74594 Kreßberg / DE | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 23180719.9 | 21.06.2023 | [2024/03] | Priority number, date | DE202210117200 | 11.07.2022 Original published format: DE102022117200 | [2024/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4306916 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01G17/00, G01G23/00, B65B3/04, B65B3/28, G01G15/00 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
G01G17/00 (EP,CN);
G01G21/22 (US);
B65B3/003 (EP);
B65B3/04 (EP);
B65B3/28 (EP);
B65B43/42 (EP);
B65B7/161 (EP);
B65B7/2821 (EP);
G01G13/006 (US);
G01G13/30 (US);
G01G15/00 (EP);
G01G19/52 (US);
G01G23/00 (CN);
G01G23/002 (EP);
B01L2200/025 (US);
B01L9/543 (US);
B65B3/006 (US);
B65B57/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM WIEGEN EINZELNER BEHÄLTNISSE, SOWIE EIN SET MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2024/03] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR WEIGHING INDIVIDUAL CONTAINERS AND A SET COMPRISING SUCH A DEVICE | [2024/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PESAGE DE RÉCIPIENTS INDIVIDUELS, AINSI QU'ENSEMBLE COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2024/03] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 13.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102017207307 (BAUSCH STROEBEL MASCHF ILSHOFEN GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] *[I] 2-5,7,10-13 | by applicant | DE102016207600 |